NORTH TO NORTH HEALTH PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1123805
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £311 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £400 £0 £860 £6.22k £86
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A