SKRUM

Charity number: 1123597
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £47.72k £60.86k £79.19k £44.87k £23.49k
Total expenditure £24.40k £60.63k £88.29k £41.95k £43.23k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A