THE LEWES PRIORY TRUST

Charity number: 1123751
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 May 2018 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 12 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 09 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 04 July 2016 On time Download