WE:ARE Women's Empowerment And Recovery Educators

Charity number: 1123337
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 12 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 19 July 2016 On time Download