WE:ARE Women's Empowerment And Recovery Educators

Charity number: 1123337
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Deborah Edwards Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
Joanne Godman Trustee 26 March 2020 None on record
JOHN GUGGENHEIM Trustee 01 March 2018 None on record
Dr Andrew Coward Trustee 11 July 2016 None on record
Susan Need Trustee 09 September 2020 None on record