HOLLOWAY HALL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1123156
Charity reporting is up to date (141 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bruce Lines Chair 25 April 2019 None on record
Neil Andrew Thompson Trustee 10 April 2017 None on record
Robert Nock Trustee 30 September 2016 None on record
graham andrews Trustee 08 July 2012 None on record
Jo Chambers Trustee 03 March 2018 None on record
Dennis Choyce Trustee 09 April 2017 None on record