Accounts and annual returns IGBO WOMEN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION OF LIVERPOOL

Charity number: 1124018
Charity reporting is up to date (50 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 March 2024 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 March 2024 415 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 March 2024 780 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 March 2024 1145 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1628 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1628 days