THE HA.SH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1123242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £45 £20.02k £75.02k £30.05k £35.09k
Total expenditure £32.29k £25.72k £45.38k £39.21k £28.38k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A