CHARMS THE ESSEX THERAPY CENTRE

Charity number: 1123446
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £42.79k £42.65k £40.65k £47.57k £53.66k
Total expenditure £41.61k £45.80k £37.85k £47.77k £48.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £4.00k £3.00k £3.00k £7.00k