THE HACKNEY SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 1126736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required