THE HACKNEY SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 1126736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.01k £15.27k £8.02k £8.14k £10.82k
Total expenditure £6.65k £14.92k £7.67k £5.94k £5.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £300 N/A N/A N/A