ST JOSEPH'S NURSERY

Charity number: 1123537
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
EMMA LYNWEN COLES Trustee 19 March 2015
THE KINGFISHER (ESSEX) CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Rebecca Perry Chair 24 March 2021 None on record
Genevieve Owen Trustee 26 October 2020 None on record
Arlene Bradford Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
Dr Laura Ayling Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
Soraya Coltro Trustee 23 March 2018 None on record