Accounts and annual returns Race Equality Network

Charity number: 1124251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required