Trustees Race Equality Network

Charity number: 1124251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
YUSUF KAROLIA Chair
GRANGE INTERLINK LIMITED
Received: On time
Shadim Hussain Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Anne Marie Smith Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Nadera Amini Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Manjit Kaur Trustee 01 August 2020
GURDWARA SINGH SABHA
Received: On time
Charles Dacres Trustee 01 August 2020
None on record
ASHOK KUMAR NAIR Trustee 01 October 2010
BRADFORD PUNJABI CULTURAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Abdul Ismail Trustee 01 October 2000
BRADFORD AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY EMPOWERMENT NETWORK
Received: On time
Mohammed Salam Trustee 01 October 2000
None on record