THE THOMAS MOFFITT CLARK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1123591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 10/10/2016 10/10/2017 10/10/2018 10/10/2019 10/10/2020
Total gross income £45.04k £49.25k £49.54k £29.35k £20.38k
Total expenditure £35.94k £53.40k £49.09k £47.68k £48.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A