BRIDGES HULL LTD

Charity number: 1123951
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 16 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 16 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 09 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 09 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 09 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 09 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 18 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 18 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 06 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 06 June 2017 On time Download