THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF SAINT DUNSTAN, CRANBROOK

Charity number: 1126417
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 September 2020 229 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 27 February 2017 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required