Accounts and annual returns REGENERATION ASSOCIATION SOMERTON COMMUNITY AT LARGE

Charity number: 1124771
Charity reporting is up to date (43 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 March 2022 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 March 2022 43 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 January 2020 342 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 08 January 2020 342 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 18 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window