Financial history REGENERATION ASSOCIATION SOMERTON COMMUNITY AT LARGE

Charity number: 1124771
Charity reporting is up to date (43 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £57.04k £66.26k £49.22k £49.22k £45.00k
Total expenditure £73.89k £77.44k £76.38k £27.16k £40.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £31.35k £1.19k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £40.00k