MADINATUL ULOOM WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1125118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 January 2020 03 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 03 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 03 January 2019 07 August 2020 278 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 04 January 2018 24 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 03 January 2017 08 April 2018 156 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 03 January 2016 18 December 2016 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 January 2016 Not Required