MADINATUL ULOOM WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1125118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 03/01/2016 03/01/2017 04/01/2018 03/01/2019 03/01/2020
Total gross income £3.68k £4.65k £2.67k £3.00k £2.20k
Total expenditure £3.23k £3.60k £2.23k £2.50k £1.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A