AMBER TRAINING, ADVISORY & SUPPORT SERVICES

Charity number: 1124304
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 09 April 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 09 April 2021 9 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 29 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 29 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 30 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 30 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 09 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 09 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 22 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 22 February 2017 On time Download