THE ASDA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1124268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £8.23m £7.70m £5.08m £4.55m £4.11m
Total expenditure £6.97m £5.34m £6.58m £6.32m £5.05m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.71m £6.90m £4.15m £4.35m £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.51m £784.16k £926.73k £191.08k £4.11m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £13.71k £17.44k £2.33k £12.40k £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.72m £5.34m £6.58m £6.32m £5.05m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £247.82k £228.93k £211.73k £217.60k £342.21k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £4.43m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0