Trustees THE ASDA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1124268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Selby Chair 10 June 2022
ROYAL AIR FORCE MUSEUM
Received: On time
ROYAL AIR FORCE MUSEUM
Recently registered
Jodie Tate Trustee 01 February 2021
None on record
Patricia Mitchell Trustee 01 June 2020
None on record
Susan Hennessey Trustee 01 June 2020
None on record
Simon Lewis Trustee 01 June 2020
None on record
Jason Martin Trustee 02 December 2016
None on record
Jane Earnshaw Trustee 11 December 2015
None on record
JOHN GILES COOKMAN Trustee
None on record