AID AND CARE TRUST

Charity number: 1125162
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 27 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required