AID AND CARE TRUST

Charity number: 1125162
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6.34k £11.18k £2.87k £2.59k £4.73k
Total expenditure £4.98k £10.92k £2.15k £2.50k £7.56k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A