S & J CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1124093
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £44.83k £44.28k £54.58k £53.94k £29.86k
Total expenditure £41.00k £42.93k £50.68k £55.12k £38.68k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A