Financial history THE EVERYONE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1139665
Charity reporting is overdue by 724 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £0 £1.34k £1.50k £2.20k £1.63k
Total expenditure £5.31k £361 £2.64k £1.65k £2.43k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A