TRELIX CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1124952
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 27 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 18 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 18 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 02 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 02 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 19 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 19 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 26 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 26 October 2016 On time Download