TRELIX CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1124952
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £93.75k £80.78k £94.82k £107.05k £62.20k
Total expenditure £97.71k £126.35k £132.12k £107.69k £62.21k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A