Accounts and annual returns WEST HEATH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1124993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 08 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 March 2020 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 09 March 2020 38 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 14 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 05 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window