Financial history WEST HEATH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1124993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £112.08k £89.59k £91.43k £89.52k £68.77k
Total expenditure £131.99k £87.07k £85.75k £78.69k £59.60k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £10.00k N/A N/A £43.80k