Trustees WEST HEATH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1124993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL ANTHONY BENNETT Chair
WEST HEATH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Eleanor Jane Brown Trustee 13 January 2022
None on record
John Terry Gregory Trustee 15 January 2019
WEST HEATH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Theresa Salmon Trustee 21 November 2017
None on record
Anita Jane Jeskins Trustee 06 June 2017
None on record
Barry Griffin Trustee 14 April 2016
WEST HEATH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Marie Frances Henry Trustee 14 April 2016
WEST HEATH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Michael John Perry Trustee 15 October 2013
WEST HEATH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time