SOUTH LONDON COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT SERVICES

Charity number: 1125078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £20.96k £15.24k £42.55k £26.77k £37.84k
Total expenditure £15.79k £11.35k £26.50k £28.98k £37.78k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A