SURREY HEATH MUSLIM ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1126441
Charity reporting is up to date (38 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
03/04/2016 03/04/2017 03/04/2018 03/04/2019 03/04/2020
Total gross income £5.86k £13.35k £20.85k £15.06k £19.14k
Total expenditure £1.28k £8.27k £16.70k £10.19k £11.06k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A