FRIENDS OF BROOKE HILL ACADEMY TRUST

Charity number: 1124401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 13 September 2020 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 20 January 2020 204 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 09 July 2018 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 07 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required