Accounts and annual returns TEMPO TIME CREDITS LIMITED

Charity number: 1135143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 08 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window