SCOTT BOLTON TRUST

Charity number: 1125000
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 November 2020 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 26 November 2020 149 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 11 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 15 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 15 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required