Trustees GIRTON COLLEGE
Charity number: 1137541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Revd Dr Charles John Mackinnon Bell | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Judith Drinkwater | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Helen Anne Van Noorden | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Antonia Vogt | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
James Edward Joseph Walsh | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Ianthe Hill | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Harriet Dorothy Allen | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jared Seabook-Wafer | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Benjamin John Griffin | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Jenny Kaye Blackhurst | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Elisabeth Clara Kendall | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Gail Antoinette Williams | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Nicholas Fairclough | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Abigail Lesley Fowden | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Simone Maghenzani | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|||||||
James Spencer Anderson | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||||
Dr HILARY FRANCES MARLOW | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.