Financial history THE BASCULE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1127475
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £95.50k £94.05k £149.90k £122.69k £72.06k
Total expenditure £95.19k £92.33k £138.62k £125.75k £91.38k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A