HANNAH MEMORIAL ACADEMY TRUST

Charity number: 1125447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 February 2020 14 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 15 February 2019 05 March 2020 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 15 February 2018 15 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 15 February 2017 06 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 15 February 2016 30 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 February 2016 Not Required