Financial history 4TH ASHBY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1125053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £20.63k £30.38k £28.13k £8.55k £16.50k
Total expenditure £20.55k £29.04k £22.52k £9.89k £15.98k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £3.56k £400 N/A £6.19k