BANGLADESH WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1127412
Charity reporting is overdue by 140 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £2.54k £11.20k £9.98k £3.68k £11.48k
Total expenditure £2.32k £2.87k £2.32k £9.59k £16.61k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A