HUXLEY TRUST

Charity number: 1126431
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2020 28 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2019 16 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2018 14 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2017 28 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2016 26 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2016 Not Required