WOMBLETON SPORTS AND RECREATION CLUB

Charity number: 1126022
Charity reporting is overdue by 156 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £5.39k £4.96k £5.14k £34.89k £9.51k
Total expenditure £3.41k £5.59k £2.79k £32.55k £4.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £30.35k N/A