Financial history FRIENDS OF MARY STANFORD LIFEBOAT HOUSE

Charity number: 1126067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £3.67k £651 £315 £102 £310
Total expenditure £494 £322 £332 £319 £145
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A