Trustees WORLD MUSCLE SOCIETY
Charity number: 1126862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Teresinha Evangelista | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Dr. Benedikt Schoser | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jordi Diaz-Manera | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Alan Beggs | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
A/ Professor Gianina Ravenscroft | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lindsay Alfano | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Dowling | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR Laurent Servais | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Werner Stenzel | Trustee | 06 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR John Vissing | Trustee | 07 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR Francesco Muntoni | Trustee | 03 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr GISELE BONNE | Trustee | 25 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR KEVIN FLANIGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR VOLKER STRAUB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR ICHIZO NISHINO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR ANDERS OLDFORS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.