IDOMA COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (UK)

Charity number: 1125339
Charity reporting is overdue by 726 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 360 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 360 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 726 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 726 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 04 June 2017 216 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required