Trustees ASPIRE SPORTS AND CULTURAL TRUST

Charity number: 1125995
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Linda Susan Castle Trustee 10 August 2021
None on record
Karen Dawe Trustee 13 May 2019
None on record
Christopher John Rawlins Trustee 14 January 2019
None on record
Paul Geoffrey Toleman Trustee 21 May 2018
GLOUCESTER HISTORIC BUILDINGS LIMITED
Received: On time
Gerald Robin Weston Bown Trustee 21 May 2018
None on record
Patricia Ann Juby Trustee 21 May 2018
None on record
Neil Hampson Trustee 03 August 2015
GLOUCESTERSHIRE COMMUNITY NURSES FUND
Received: On time
GLOUCESTER HISTORIC BUILDINGS LIMITED
Received: On time
Mr Martyn White Trustee 29 January 2014
LLANTHONY SECUNDA PRIORY TRUST
Received: On time
GLOUCESTER HISTORIC BUILDINGS LIMITED
Received: On time
THE GLOUCESTER CHARITIES TRUST
Received: On time
GLOUCESTER ATHLETICS TRACK MANAGEMENT LIMITED
Received: On time
GLOUCESTER CIVIC TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time