HEXHAM AND TYNEDALE COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1125705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £155.83k £160.92k £150.78k £172.68k £184.80k
Total expenditure £135.31k £145.13k £150.59k £168.57k £166.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.50k £6.50k £6.00k £5.50k £5.50k